This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2023 at 07:10:32 (UTC).

Gemaehlich et al v.Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Gemaehlich filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-07518

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keith Gemaehlich

Betty Gemaehlich

Defendants

Albay Construction Company

ALFA LAVAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY and SHARPLES CORPORATION

Aurora Pump Company

A.W. Chesterton Co.

Bigge Crane and Rigging Co.

BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.

CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC.

CINCINNATI VALVE COMPANY, individually and as successor to LUNKENHEIMER VALVES

CLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES

Crosby Valve, Inc.

ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.

FLOWSERVE US INC., individually and as successor in interest to EDWARD VALVE, INC.

FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY aka NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC as successor in interest to FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION and FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GARDNER DENVER, INC. f/k/a GARDNER DENVER MACHINERY, INC.

General Electric Company

Goulds Pumps, Inc.

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benno Behnam Ashrafi

Attorney at Weitz and Luxenberg P.C.

1880 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Josiah Parker

Attorney at Weitz and Luxenberg

1880 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Anne Bellow

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

Hanna M. Thompson

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield, PLLP

2185 N. California Blvd., Ste. 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Melanie Leigh Ameele

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

181 W. Huntington Drive, Suite 210

Monrovia, CA 91016

John Russell Lister

Attorney at Palmieri Tyler Wiener Wilhelm Waldron

1900 Main Street, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92614

Andrew Livingston Sharp

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

2185 North California Boulevard, Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-7323

Amy Jo Talarico

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joseph Duffy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marisa Renee Chaves

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Daniel James Kelly

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

201 Mission Street, Suite 2310

San Francisco, CA 94105

Francis Dennis Pond

Attorney at Pond North LLP

800 S. Figueroa St., Suite 970

Los Angeles, CA 90017

John R Ybarra

Attorney at Pond North LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Timothy Carter Pieper

Attorney at Pond North LLP

800 S. Figueroa St., Suite 970

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

Carrie S. Lin

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

James G. Scadden

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Glen R. Powell

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Edward Martinovich

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao & Silverstein

550 South Hope Street, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kelley Mahoney

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Stephen Vincent Harrington

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1637

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#100

(#100) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Marshall Thacker on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#99

(#99) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Renstrom on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Renstrom, Peter) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#98

(#98) NOTICE by REDCO CORPORATION f/k/a CRANE CO. f/k/a CRANE COMPANY and JENKINS VALVES of Withdrawal of Counsel (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 1/23/2023) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#96

(#96) Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company (Bellow, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#95

(#95) NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Scadden (Scadden, James) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#94

(#94) NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and State Court Jury Demand (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

56 #2

Proposed Order

56 #1

Declaration of Josiah Parker

56 #56

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY TALARICO] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR ITT LLC] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/6/2022) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF REFILING STATE COURT Answer to Removal Complaint byCLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES. (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/6/2022) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-E iso Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Marshall Thacker on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Renstrom on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Renstrom, Peter) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) NOTICE by REDCO CORPORATION f/k/a CRANE CO. f/k/a CRANE COMPANY and JENKINS VALVES of Withdrawal of Counsel (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 1/23/2023) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #56 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Docket(#97) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on March 3, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. VACATING MOTION TO REMAND hearing set for February 10, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company (Bellow, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Scadden (Scadden, James) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and State Court Jury Demand (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE of Appearance by Glen R. Powell (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA CHAVES] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY TALARICO] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR ITT LLC] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/6/2022) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REFILING STATE COURT Answer to Removal Complaint byCLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES. (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/6/2022) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV020120. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17770369). Filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E iso Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less