This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2020 at 13:14:49 (UTC).

GEM Razorback, LLC v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 GEM Razorback, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEM Razorback, LLC

Defendant

Oasis Petroleum North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew W Sorensen

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm

218 N.P. Avenue

Fargo, NE 58107

Joshua A. Swanson

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm (Fargo)

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Jonathan Forster

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP (Bismarck)

100 West Broadway, Suite 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502-2798

John W. Morrison, Jr.

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP (Bismarck)

100 West Broadway, Suite 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502-2798

Zachary R. Eiken

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

100 W. Broadway, Ste. 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502

 

Court Documents

#20

#18

#16

#15

1 #19

Exhibit R-Order for Extension of Time

1 #16

Exhibit O-Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint

1 #15

Exhibit N-Reassignment Order

1 #12

Exhibit K-Notice of Appearance

1 #11

Exhibit J-Reassignment Order

1 #10

Exhibit I-Certificate of Service

1 #9

Exhibit H-Demand for Change of Judge

1 #8

Exhibit G-Notification of Assignment and Case Number

1 #7

Exhibit F-Affidavit of Service

1 #6

Exhibit E-Email from Carlson to GEM

1 #5

Exhibit D-Oil and Gas Lease

1 #4

Exhibit C-Affidavit of Joshua Swanson

1 #3

Exhibit B-Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A-Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Early Settlement Conference REset for 7/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(Previously set for 5/12/2020). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#19) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Status Conference held on 2/13/2020. (JS) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: Early Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketReset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 (3 days) before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Previously set in error as a jury trial. (kmk) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketReset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 (3 days)before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (change as to presiding judge only) (kmk) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#17) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #15 Motion to Continue Status Conference. Status Conference REset for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set for 2/06/2020) (BG) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#14) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 12/9/2019. (JS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (3 days) (JS) Modified on 12/9/2019 to add number of days. Regenerated NEF. (rh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Discovery Motions due by 10/16/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/6/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/24/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 11/13/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 6/4/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/7/2020. Threshold Motions due by 6/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2020. (JS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#8) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (cjs) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC identifying Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum LLC, Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum Inc. for Oasis Petroleum North America LLC.. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by GEM Razorback, LLC. (rh) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/8/2019. (cjs) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GEM Razorback, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/8/2019. (cjs) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2019-CV-00425. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000074 filed by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Summons, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Joshua Swanson, #5 Exhibit D-Oil and Gas Lease, #6 Exhibit E-Email from Carlson to GEM, #7 Exhibit F-Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit G-Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #9 Exhibit H-Demand for Change of Judge, #10 Exhibit I-Certificate of Service, #11 Exhibit J-Reassignment Order, #12 Exhibit K-Notice of Appearance, #13 Exhibit L-Demand for Change of Judge, #14 Exhibit M-Certificate of Service, #15 Exhibit N-Reassignment Order, #16 Exhibit O-Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #17 Exhibit P-Proposed Order, #18 Exhibit Q-Certificate of Service, #19 Exhibit R-Order for Extension of Time, #20 Exhibit S-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #21 Exhibit T-Certificate of Service)(cjs) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less