This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2021 at 13:02:55 (UTC).

Gellner et al v. Kennedy et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Gellner filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Kennedy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Crotty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04618

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Crotty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chad Gellner

Melvyn Klein

Matthew Rufo

Defendants

Rebekah Dopp

Christine St. Clare

Maryscott Greenwood

Mark Castaneda

Michael Auerbach

Brendan Kennedy

Nominal Defendant

Tilray, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas James McKenna

Attorney at Gainey & McKenna

501 Fifth Avenue, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Nominal Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Tiffany Anna Miao

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 3600

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20cv3459. Document filed by Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tiffany Anna Miao on behalf of Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc...(Miao, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Verification re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Melvyn Klein..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin on behalf of Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc...(York-Erwin, Genevieve) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20282452)Document filed by Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo, Chad Gellner..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-03459-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20cv3459. Document filed by Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Thomas James McKenna, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (wb) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tiffany Anna Miao on behalf of Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc...(Miao, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Verification re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Melvyn Klein..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin on behalf of Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc...(York-Erwin, Genevieve) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 20cv3459. (pc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Thomas James McKenna, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas James McKenna. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20282452)Document filed by Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo, Chad Gellner..(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tilray, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. McKenna