This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2022 at 08:52:28 (UTC).

Gelfand, MD v. Acumed, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Gelfand, MD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Acumed, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01753

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Jeffrey Gelfand, MD

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Acumed, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Chandran B. Iyer

Richard Juang

Ronald M. Daignault

Tedd W. Van Buskirk

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jason A. Engel

Steven L. Caponi

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

600 N. King Street, Suite 901

Wilmington, DE 19801

Devon C. Beane

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before March 9, 2022, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/9/2022.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#14

(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc. for Acumed, LLC filed by Acumed, LLC. (Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant Acumed, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Jeffery Gelfand, MD's Complaint and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Jeffrey Gelfand, MD by Acumed, LLC.(Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason A. Engel, Devon C. Beane, and Jonah B. Heemstra - filed by Acumed, LLC. (Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer and Richard Juang - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 7, 2022 - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Acumed, LLC, Colson Medical, LLC (Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Colson Medical, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Acumed, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

4 #1

Summons Issued

#4

(#4) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Acumed, LLC on 12/14/2021; Colson Medical, LLC on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,282,674 B2 ;US 9,149,312 B2. (apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant Acumed, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Jeffery Gelfand, MD's Complaint and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Jeffrey Gelfand, MD by Acumed, LLC.(Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before March 9, 2022, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/9/2022.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Devon C. Beane for Acumed, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc. for Acumed, LLC filed by Acumed, LLC. (Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant Acumed, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Jeffery Gelfand, MD's Complaint and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Jeffrey Gelfand, MD by Acumed, LLC.(Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk for Jeffrey Gelfand, MD added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases:1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(srs) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (12 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC), (9 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk, filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/4/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jason A. Engel for Acumed, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason A. Engel, Devon C. Beane, and Jonah B. Heemstra, filed by Acumed, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/2/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason A. Engel, Devon C. Beane, and Jonah B. Heemstra - filed by Acumed, LLC. (Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer and Richard Juang - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 7, 2022 - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Acumed, LLC, Colson Medical, LLC (Caponi, Steven) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Colson Medical, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Acumed, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Acumed, LLC on 12/14/2021; Colson Medical, LLC on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,282,674 B2 ;US 9,149,312 B2. (apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Acumed, LLC, Colson Medical, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3763159.) - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acumed, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Alexander Engel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven L. Caponi