This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 14:15:35 (UTC).

GEISS v. WALMART STORES EAST, LP

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 GEISS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART STORES EAST, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TODD GEISS

TERRI GEISS

Defendants

WALMART STORES EAST, LP

WALMART STORES EAST, INC.

WALMART, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James E. Stoltz

Attorney at GERLING LAW OFFICE

519 Main Street Walkway, P O Box 3203

Evansville, IN 47731-3203

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Kincaid Adams

Attorney at BLACKBURN DOMENE & BURCHETT

614 W. Main Street, Suite 3000

Louisville, KY 40202

Emily C. Lamb

Attorney at BLACKBURN DOMENE & BURCHETT

614 W. Main Street, Suite 3000

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kincaid Adams on behalf of Defendant WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Adams, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 09:30AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/21/2022.(JRB) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants WALMART STORES EAST, INC., WALMART STORES EAST, LP, WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Uniform Protective Order)(Lamb, Emily) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

5 #1

Uniform Protective Order

#6

(#6) UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/30/2022.(JRB) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/30/2022.(JRB) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants WALMART STORES EAST, INC., WALMART STORES EAST, LP, WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Uniform Protective Order)(Lamb, Emily) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 09:30AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/21/2022.(JRB) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kincaid Adams on behalf of Defendant WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Adams, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warrick, case number 87C01-2110-CT-002119, filed by WALMART STORES EAST, LP. AINSDC-7268047 FILING FEE $402.00 PAID (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Chronological Case Summary, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance ECL, #7 Corporate Disclosure)(Lamb, Emily) Modified on 9/7/2022 (NLR). (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily C. Lamb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Kincaid Adams