This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2020 at 09:04:03 (UTC).

Geiger v. M1 Support Services, LP

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Geiger filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against M1 Support Services, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock and David A. Sanders. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Geiger

Defendant

M1 Support Services, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Tammy L. Baker

Yvonne N. Maddalena

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/21/2020. (sko)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint. (Maddalena, Yvonne)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yvonne N. Maddalena on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP (Maddalena, Yvonne)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement by Tammy L. Baker on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Yvonne N. Maddalena. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/7/20. (cs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) EXHIBIT re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Yvonne N. Maddalena,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1875977) TN - COGS. (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. M1 Support Services, LP answer due 12/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/1/20. (cs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by M1 Support Services, LP. (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Yvonne N. Maddalena,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1875977); Please provide an updated certificate of good standing from state licensing authority of Tennessee as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1 (d)(4). (jla)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Yvonne N. Maddalena,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1875977) by M1 Support Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020

DocketReset Deadlines: M1 Support Services, LP answer due 12/2/2020. (cs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/17/20. (cs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by M1 Support Services, LP. (Baker, Tammy) Modified on 11/18/2020 (jla).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed M1 Support Services, LP served on 10/28/2020. (tab)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, LP. Returned to pro se plaintiff for service. (tab)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CONSENT & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Thomas Geiger (tab)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300026752, filed by Thomas Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Email dated 8/5/2020, #2 Exhibit 2 Email dated 10/14/2020, #3 Exhibit 3 Religious Freedom Training, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less