Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 09:26:57 (UTC).

Geico Marine Insurance Company v. Tartaglino

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Geico Marine Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Tartaglino. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00462

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Geico Marine Insurance Company

Defendant and Counter Claimant

John Tartaglino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Motola-Davis

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

1 Citizens Plaza, Suite 1120

Providence, RI 02903

Samuel A. Kennedy-Smith

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

1 Citizens Plaza, Floor 2

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Peter Brent Regan

Attorney at Sayer Regan & Thayer, LLP

130 Bellevue Avenue, Suite 2

Newport, RI 02840

Keith B. Kyle

Attorney at Orson and Brusini

195 Broadway, 2Nd Floor, 846-7777, Fax: 848-7141

Newport, RI 02840-2516

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Brent Regan on behalf of John Tartaglino (Regan, Peter) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit application

#8

(#8) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Geico Marine Insurance Company by John Tartaglino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit application)(Kyle, Keith) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Kyle on behalf of John Tartaglino (Kyle, Keith) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Geico Marine Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to John Tartaglino. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Request filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1562358 ), filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Brent Regan on behalf of John Tartaglino (Regan, Peter) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Geico Marine Insurance Company by John Tartaglino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit application)(Kyle, Keith) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Kyle on behalf of John Tartaglino (Kyle, Keith) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Geico Marine Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to John Tartaglino. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Request filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint: CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY: This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1562358 ), filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint: CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY: This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1562358 ), filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Motola-Davis