This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2019 at 05:49:58 (UTC).

Gehant v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability case was filed by Gehant against Air Liquid Systems Corporation in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00732

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Shelly D. Dick

 

Party Details

Defendants

Foster Wheeler Corporation

IDEX Corporation

Utica Mutual Insurance Company

McDermott, Inc.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

The Nash Engineering Company

General Electric Company

Technip USA, Inc.

Ingersoll-Rand Company

TIG Insurance Company

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#38) RULING granting #6 Motion to Dismiss, and CBS is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#38

(#38) RULING granting #6 Motion to Dismiss, and CBS is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #4

Proposed Pleading; Order

#3

(#37) RULING granting #3 Motion to Dismiss, and GE is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#37

(#37) RULING granting #3 Motion to Dismiss, and GE is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) RULING granting #6 Motion to Dismiss, and CBS is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) RULING granting #3 Motion to Dismiss, and GE is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/5/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/21/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION to Dismiss Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC by Jerome J Gehant. (Anderman, Jody) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/20/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION to Dismiss Utica Mutual Insurance Company by Jerome J Gehant. (Anderman, Jody) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Utica Mutual Insurance Company. (Kohn, Susan) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses of General Electric Company to the Petition for Damages to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Bowlin, Angela) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter to Attorney Cameron R. Waddell regarding James R. Murrell who is Co-Counsel for party Jerome J. Gehant. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Joinder with #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Corporation.. (Hainkel, John) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 688127. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2020723), filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Notice of Compliance)(Hainkel, John) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.