This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:39:56 (UTC).

Gee v. Corning Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Gee filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Corning Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-06060

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Violet R Gee

Addison, NY 14801

Defendant

Corning Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Corning Inc., filed by Violet R Gee. No fee received.(RE) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a blank form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, she shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/28/2022. Mailed a copy of this order to the plaintiff and a form motion for IFP with supporting affirmation.(TF) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action. Signed by Clerk of Court on 3/1/2022. Mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff.(TF) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action. Signed by Clerk of Court on 3/1/2022. Mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff.(TF) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a blank form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, she shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/28/2022. Mailed a copy of this order to the plaintiff and a form motion for IFP with supporting affirmation.(TF) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, ADR Notification and pro se assistance program info mailed to plaintiff. (RE) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of MANUAL/RETAINED FILING by Violet R Gee re #1 due to quality of scan. (RE) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Corning Inc., filed by Violet R Gee. No fee received.(RE) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corning Incorporated is a litigant