This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2020 at 10:03:50 (UTC).

Geary v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Geary filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg N. Stivers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Geary

Defendant

Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Florio

1500 Story Avenue

Louisville, KY 40206

Defendant Attorney

Kevin E. Roberts

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Indianapolis

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/23/2020 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has to and including 11/25/2020 to file their answer. cc: Counsel(JWM) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/24/2020 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall have through 10/26/2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's complaint. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A- state court documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04657. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-318977). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- state court documents, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/23/2020 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has to and including 11/25/2020 to file their answer. cc: Counsel(JWM) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/24/2020 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall have through 10/26/2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's complaint. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04657. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-318977). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- state court documents, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less