This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 09:32:22 (UTC).

Gayane Gyurjyan v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Gayane Gyurjyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06461

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gayane Gyurjyan

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 to 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harry S Kaloustian

Attorney at Kaloustian Law Group APC

6320 Canoga Avenue Suite 630

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Daniel S Imber

Attorney at Imber Law Group APC

9454 Wilshire Bouelvard Penthouse

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald.Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 1/4/2021. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 5/28/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions 6/28/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 8/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/13/2021 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 3 to 5 Days) set for 9/28/2021 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/12/2021. (iv) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Scheduling Report ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Gayane Gyurjyan.. (Kaloustian, Harry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 08/31/20 at 11:00 AM (pg) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on July 20, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV16780 Receipt No: ACACDC-27279872 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kate S Lehrman added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald.Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 1/4/2021. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 5/28/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions 6/28/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 8/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/13/2021 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 3 to 5 Days) set for 9/28/2021 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/12/2021. (iv) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's General Order 20-09, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 11:00am. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Scheduling Report ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Gayane Gyurjyan.. (Kaloustian, Harry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 08/31/20 at 11:00 AM (pg) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Jury Demand #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on July 20, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (filed in state court 7/17/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Gayane Gyurjyan, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC served on 6/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 1) (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Gayane Gyurjyan. (filed in state court 5/4/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 3) (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV16780 Receipt No: ACACDC-27279872 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kate S Lehrman added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman