Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 06:44:56 (UTC).

GAVIN v. UNITED AIRLINES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 GAVIN filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against UNITED AIRLINES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08924

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONARD GAVIN

Defendants

ABC COMPANY 1-3 (said name being fictitious and unknown)

ABM AVIATION, INC.

DEF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (same name being fictitious and unknown)

UNITED AIRLINES, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-10 (Said names being fictitious and unknown)

ABC CORPORATION 1-10

AIRSERV CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT D. KUTTNER

2020, 2168 Millburn Ave., Suite 205

Maplewood, NJ 07040

Defendant Attorney

ERIK TUCKER KALLHOVD

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

140 Broadway, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Letter/Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission as to BARRY S. ALEXANDER, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/1/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

6 #3

Proposed Order Admitting Barry S. Alexander, Esq. Pro Hac Vice

6 #2

Certification of Barry Steven Alexander

6 #1

Certification of Erik T. Kallhovd

#6

(#6) Letter from Erik T. Kallhovd. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erik T. Kallhovd, #2 Certification of Barry Steven Alexander, #3 Proposed Order Admitting Barry S. Alexander, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM AVIATION, INC. identifying ABM INDUSTRIES, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. identifying United Continental Holding, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ABM AVIATION, INC.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABM AVIATION, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. SUPERIOR COURT OF ESSEX COUNTY, L-000963-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9527148), filed by ABM AVIATION, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KALLHOVD, ERIK) Modified on 3/28/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee as to BARRY S. ALEXANDER, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW039573 (dam, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Letter/Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission as to BARRY S. ALEXANDER, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/1/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Erik T. Kallhovd. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erik T. Kallhovd, #2 Certification of Barry Steven Alexander, #3 Proposed Order Admitting Barry S. Alexander, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM AVIATION, INC. identifying ABM INDUSTRIES, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. identifying United Continental Holding, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ABM AVIATION, INC.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (KALLHOVD, ERIK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABM AVIATION, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. SUPERIOR COURT OF ESSEX COUNTY, L-000963-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9527148), filed by ABM AVIATION, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KALLHOVD, ERIK) Modified on 3/28/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRSERV CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant