This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 06:21:05 (UTC).

Gavin et al v. AGCO Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Gavin filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AGCO Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02303

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Defendants

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO.

General Refractories Company

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC

Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC

Uniroyal, Inc.

General Electric Company

Ross Operating Valve Company

Ford Motor Company

Pfizer, Inc.

Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC

DAP Products Inc

Bridgestone/Firestone America's Holding, Inc.

Homasote Company

Vellumoid, Inc.

3M Company

American Biltrite, Inc.

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Flowserve Corporation

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Thomas Philip Kurland

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Jason Michael Hodrinsky

Attorney at Gori, Julian & Associates, P.C.

360 Lexington Ave., 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Suzanne M. Halbardier

Attorney at Barry McTiernan & Moore

2 Rector Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Brian Kenneth Cifuentes

Attorney at Leader & Berkon LLP

630 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Lisa M. Pascarella

Attorney at Pascarella DiVita, PLLC

2137 Route 35, Suite 290

Holmdel, NJ 07733

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiffs Lisa Gavin and Edward Gavin take nothing of defendants; that this case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; and that this case is hereby closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 1/23/2020. (Toritto, Jim) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#24

(#24) ORDER DISMISSING CASE; ORDERED that the case be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of prosecution, pursuant to Rule 41(b), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any pending motions, enter judgment, and mark the case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 1/21/2020. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#23

(#23) Notice of Impending Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute the Action: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this case will be dismissed without prejudice, for lack of prosecution if, within fifteen (15) days from the date of this order, no further explanation for the lack of proceedings has been FILED and APPROVED by the Court. All responses must be filed under the Electronic Case Filing system. The Clerk of the Court is directed also to mail a cop of this order to the Plaintiff's attorney. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/26/2019. (CM to plaintiff's attorney by USPS mail) (Florio, Lisa) Modified docket text on 11/26/2019 (Florio, Lisa). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER of discontinuance with prejudice and without costs as to Johnson and Johnson. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Johnson & Johnson as a defendantOrdered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/8/2019. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#18

13 #3

Exhibit Johnson & Johnson Responses to Interrogatories

13 #2

Exhibit Momorandum of Opinion

13 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand

#13

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit D, Electronic docket

1 #4

Exhibit C, Motion to Fix Venue for Claims (Del.)

1 #3

Exhibit B, J&J's responsive pleading

1 #2

Exhibit A, Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiffs Lisa Gavin and Edward Gavin take nothing of defendants; that this case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; and that this case is hereby closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 1/23/2020. (Toritto, Jim) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER DISMISSING CASE; ORDERED that the case be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of prosecution, pursuant to Rule 41(b), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any pending motions, enter judgment, and mark the case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 1/21/2020. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Impending Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute the Action: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this case will be dismissed without prejudice, for lack of prosecution if, within fifteen (15) days from the date of this order, no further explanation for the lack of proceedings has been FILED and APPROVED by the Court. All responses must be filed under the Electronic Case Filing system. The Clerk of the Court is directed also to mail a cop of this order to the Plaintiff's attorney. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/26/2019. (CM to plaintiff's attorney by USPS mail) (Florio, Lisa) Modified docket text on 11/26/2019 (Florio, Lisa). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiffs did not file a status report by October 15, 2019 as directed by this Court. Plaintiffs shall file a status report on or before October 25, 2019. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/18/2019. (Alessi, Samantha) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT ORDER re #22 Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties, #18 Letter filed by Johnson & Johnson, #13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Plaintiffs shall apprise the Court of the status of this action on or before October 15, 2019. Status Report due by 10/15/2019.Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/1/2019. (Alessi, Samantha) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER of discontinuance with prejudice and without costs as to Johnson and Johnson. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Johnson & Johnson as a defendantOrdered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/8/2019. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Johnson & Johnson by Johnson & Johnson (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter to the Hon. Joanna Seybert regarding the Status of J&J's Removal by Johnson & Johnson (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATE COURT RECORD received from Suffolk County Clerk's Office; E-Filed Supreme Court Case, Index No. 605836/2018. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Letter to the Hon. Joanna Seybert enclosing the Memorandum Decision and Order from Chief Judge McMahon of the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group LLC for John Crane, Inc.. (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv2305. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and supporting documents served on Jason M. Hodrinksky, Esq. on 4/19/2019, filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Johnson & Johnson (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketA completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically page 2 of the document; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 605836/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11401122) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, J&J's responsive pleading, #4 Exhibit C, Motion to Fix Venue for Claims (Del.), #5 Exhibit D, Electronic docket) (Kurland, Thomas) Modified on 4/19/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Homasote Company is a litigant

Latest cases where General Refractories Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc. is a litigant