This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

Gauthier v. Monsanto Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Gauthier filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07927

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Gauthier

Defendant

Monsanto Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen C. Peters

Attorney at Peters Law Firm LLC

1800 15Th Street, Suite 101

Denver, CO 80202

Stephen C. Peters,

Attorney at Peters Law Firm LLC

1800 15Th Street, Suite 101

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorney

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-03131. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-169) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 19-cv-3131-NYW, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2741, by Clerk on 12/2/2019. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Gauthier. Monsanto Company, Inc. served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Peters, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #3

Notice of Related Case

1 #2

Summons Summons in a Civil Action

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6978531)Attorney Stephen C. Peters added to party Amanda Gauthier(pty:pla), filed by Amanda Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Notice of Related Case)(Peters, Stephen) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:19-cv-03131, Gauthier v. Monsanto Company, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07927-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 169 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-03131. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-169) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 19-cv-3131-NYW, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2741, by Clerk on 12/2/2019. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Gauthier. Monsanto Company, Inc. served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Peters, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6978531)Attorney Stephen C. Peters added to party Amanda Gauthier(pty:pla), filed by Amanda Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Notice of Related Case)(Peters, Stephen) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.