This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 08:28:51 (UTC).

Gauthier et al v. Vitro Electric LLC

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Gauthier filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Vitro Electric LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna J. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01913

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna J. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garth Bachman

Timothy J. Gauthier

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Defendants

Vitro Electric LLC

Vitro Electric, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Declaration of Linda J. Larkin . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice re Summons Issued #3 Office Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Summons Issued #3 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vitro Electric, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/5/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7456566 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion for Entry of Default #6 against defendant Vitro Electric LLC. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendant. (bb) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Linda J. Larkin . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice re Summons Issued #3 Office Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Summons Issued #3 .) (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Vitro Electric, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/5/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7456566 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vitro Electric LLC is a litigant