This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2020 at 09:37:36 (UTC).

Gauthier et al v. Crown Voltage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Gauthier filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Crown Voltage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael H. Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01704

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy J. Gauthier

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Garth Bachman

Trustees of The Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Defendants

Stacy LaCombe

Daniel Tucker

Crown Voltage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Crown Voltage, Inc. served on 10/21/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Daniel Tucker served on 10/21/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Stacy LaCombe served on 10/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7304672 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Crown Voltage, Inc. served on 10/21/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Daniel Tucker served on 10/21/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Stacy LaCombe served on 10/9/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7304672 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Larkin