This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 08:30:48 (UTC).

Gauthier et al v. Crown Voltage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Gauthier filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Crown Voltage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Youlee Yim You. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00578

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy J Gauthier

Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee

Garth Bachman

Timothy J. Gauthier

Defendants

Stacy LaCombe

Daniel Tucker

Crown Voltage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda J. Larkin

Attorney at Bennett Hartman Morris & Kaplan LLP

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 500

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #3

Proposed Summons Amended

4 #2

Proposed Summons Amended

4 #1

Proposed Summons Amended

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Motion for Dismissal #9 . Because no answer has been filed, this court treats the motion as a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and directs the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Daniel Tucker served on 4/13/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Stacy LaCombe served on 4/13/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Crown Voltage, Inc. served on 4/14/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Crown Voltage, Inc., Stacy LaCombe, Daniel Tucker. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended Complaint Summons issued as to all Defendants. Filed by Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended, #2 Proposed Summons Amended, #3 Proposed Summons Amended). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Crown Voltage, Inc., Daniel Tucker, Stacy LaCombe. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/7/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-6513888 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Timothy J Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Larkin