This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2021 at 07:42:15 (UTC).

Gaullini-Indij et al v. Banco Popular Puerto Rico

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Gaullini-Indij filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Banco Popular Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01219

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUAN J GUALLINI INDIJ

RAQUEL MEDINA RAMPOLLA

Juan J. Guallini-Indij

Raquel Medina-Rampolla

Defendants

Banco Popular Puerto Rico

ABC Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Javier Vilarino-Santiago

Attorney at Vilarino & Associates LLC

Po Box 9022515

San Juan, PR 00902-2515

Defendant Attorney

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by Banco Popular Puerto Rico Re: #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases number 21-CV-1250 (SCC) into 12-CV-1219 (PAD) as the leading case filed by Raquel Medina-Rampolla, Juan J. Guallini-Indij filed by Banco Popular Puerto Rico. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION to dismiss as to Banco Popular Puerto Rico filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION for extension of time until July 12, 2021 to to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#14

(#14) MOTION for extension of time until July 9, 2021 to Respond to the Motion to Consolidate filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION for extension of time until July 2, 2021 to Respond to the Motion to Consolidate filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Intent to Respond by Banco Popular Puerto Rico re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases number 21-CV-1250 (SCC) into 12-CV-1219 (PAD) as the leading case (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL: See attached. The Clerk shall assign the case to another United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/15/2021. (MPL) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases number 21-CV-1250 (SCC) into 12-CV-1219 (PAD) as the leading case filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for extension of time until July 8, 2021 to to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Banco Popular de PR by Juan J. Guallini-Indij, Raquel Medina-Rampolla upon Banco Popular Puerto Rico served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Banco Popular Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Banco Popular Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7297614.), filed by JUAN J GUALLINI INDIJ, RAQUEL MEDINA RAMPOLLA. Service due by 8/9/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by Banco Popular Puerto Rico Re: #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases number 21-CV-1250 (SCC) into 12-CV-1219 (PAD) as the leading case filed by Raquel Medina-Rampolla, Juan J. Guallini-Indij filed by Banco Popular Puerto Rico. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to dismiss as to Banco Popular Puerto Rico filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for extension of time until July 12, 2021 to to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for extension of time until July 9, 2021 to Respond to the Motion to Consolidate filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for extension of time until July 2, 2021 to Respond to the Motion to Consolidate filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Intent to Respond by Banco Popular Puerto Rico re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases number 21-CV-1250 (SCC) into 12-CV-1219 (PAD) as the leading case (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #10 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Clerk on 06/15/2021. (ft) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL: See attached. The Clerk shall assign the case to another United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/15/2021. (MPL) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases number 21-CV-1250 (SCC) into 12-CV-1219 (PAD) as the leading case filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Granting #7 "Motion for Extension of Time to Respond or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than July 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/8/2021. (MPL) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for extension of time until July 8, 2021 to to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Banco Popular de PR by Juan J. Guallini-Indij, Raquel Medina-Rampolla upon Banco Popular Puerto Rico served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Banco Popular Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion Submitting Summons." The Clerk shall issue the summons accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/14/2021. (MPL) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Banco Popular Puerto Rico filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of Juan J. Guallini-Indij, Raquel Medina-Rampolla Responses due by 5/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Banco Popular Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7297614.), filed by JUAN J GUALLINI INDIJ, RAQUEL MEDINA RAMPOLLA. Service due by 8/9/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valerie M. Blay-Soler