This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2019 at 07:58:23 (UTC).

Gaub v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Gaub filed an Other lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles A. Pannell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02222

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cassandra Gaub

Defendant

Bank of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Hans Crumley

Attorney at Crumley Law Firm, P.A.

Suite 202, 140 Lakes Blvd.

Kingsland, GA 31548

Defendant Attorney

Paul Anthony Rogers

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP-GA

1230 Peachtree Street, N.E., Promenade, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309-3534

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by Cassandra Gaub (Crumley, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bank of America Corporation Answer due 6/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Up to June 25, 2019) by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Paul) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Cassandra Gaub. Bank of America Corporation served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Crumley, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cassandra Gaub. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8664733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Settlement by Cassandra Gaub (Crumley, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bank of America Corporation Answer due 6/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Up to June 25, 2019) by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Paul) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service Executed by Cassandra Gaub. Bank of America Corporation served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Crumley, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cassandra Gaub. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8664733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Hans Crumley