This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 08:30:26 (UTC).

GATX Corporation v. Georgia Power Company

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 GATX Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Georgia Power Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04790

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GATX Corporation

Defendant

Georgia Power Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Brandon Waddell

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

James William Cobb

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Elizabeth A. Thompson

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

161 North Clark, Ste 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

John C. Gekas

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

161 North Clark, Ste 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Katie Lamb Balthrop

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP-ATL

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 3000, 600 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Thomas Edward Reilly

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP-ATL

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 3000, 600 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Thomas Matthew Bailey

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP-ATL

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 3000, 600 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Reilly, Thomas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Power Company identifying Corporate Parent The Southern Company, Other Affiliate Piedmont-Forrest Corporation, Other Affiliate Southern Electric Generating Company, Other Affiliate Georgia Power Childcare, LLC, Other Affiliate AP1000 Owners Group, LLC for Georgia Power Company by Georgia Power Company.(Reilly, Thomas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Georgia Power Company. Discovery ends on 4/20/2020.(Reilly, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 4, 2019-December 6, 2019, February 17, 2020-February 21,2020, April 6, 2020-April 10,2020, June 8, 2020-June 12, 2020, September 21, 2020-September 25,2020, November 23,2020-November 27,2020, December 21,2020-January 8,2021, by James William Cobb. (Cobb, James) Modified on 11/14/2019 to edit text(bnp). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/4/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of John C. Gekas Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney John C. Gekas added appearing on behalf of GATX Corporation (pmb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by GATX Corporation. Georgia Power Company served on 10/31/2019. (Cobb, James) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/30/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Admission of John C. Gekas Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by GATX Corporation. (Cobb, James) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth A. Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9035258). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney James William Cobb added appearing on behalf of GATX Corporation (jkm) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of John C. Geckas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9035255). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Return to attorney for correction...Courts (jkm) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/28/19. (bnp) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth A. Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9035258). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by GATX Corporation. (Cobb, James) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION for Admission of John C. Geckas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9035255). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by GATX Corporation. (Cobb, James) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by GATX Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Power Company. (eop) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by GATX Corporation. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9028892) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Master Lease, #2 Exhibit -2 -Supplement No. 2, #3 Exhibit -3 -Letter Agreement, #4 Exhibit -4 -Lease Extension, #5 Exhibit -5 -Supplement No. 3, #6 Exhibit -6 -Letter Agreement, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gatx Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGIA POWER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas E. Reilly