This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:11:53 (UTC).

GATLYN v. LOWERY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GATLYN filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against LOWERY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and LACEY A COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04914

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

Presiding Judge

LACEY A COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER GATLYN

Lake Butler, FL 32054

Defendants

LOWERY

AFTERBURN

HEDDING

NEEL

DANGERFIELD

SHAULIS

JINKS

WHITE

KONZELMAN

GIVENS

NUNN

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by PETER GATLYN to: Regional Medical Center, PO Box 628, Lake Butler FL 32054. (sdw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed for a prisoner to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. (Filing Fee or IFP MOTION due by 1/13/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/11/2019. (Form mailed w/ORDER). (MB) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PETER GATLYN. (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time by PETER GATLYN. (sdw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by PETER GATLYN. (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AFTERBURN, DANGERFIELD, GIVENS, HEDDING, JINKS, KONZELMAN, LOWERY, NEEL, NUNN, SHAULIS, WHITE, filed by PETER GATLYN. (No service copies.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) RESPONSE re #7 Notice of Inquiry. (MB) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, by PETER GATLYN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order) (alb) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct file date (alb). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Inquiry, by PETER GATLYN. (MB) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

5 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining O

5 #2

Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 on or before FEBRUARY 12, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/15/2020. (MB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines re #11 ORDER. (IFP Motion or Fee due by 2/12/2020. (MB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 on or before FEBRUARY 12, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/15/2020. (MB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time by PETER GATLYN. (sdw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by PETER GATLYN to: Regional Medical Center, PO Box 628, Lake Butler FL 32054. (sdw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE re #7 Notice of Inquiry. (MB) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Inquiry, by PETER GATLYN. (MB) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed for a prisoner to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. (Filing Fee or IFP MOTION due by 1/13/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/11/2019. (Form mailed w/ORDER). (MB) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, by PETER GATLYN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order) (alb) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct file date (alb). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Pro Se Litigant (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by PETER GATLYN. (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PETER GATLYN. (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AFTERBURN, DANGERFIELD, GIVENS, HEDDING, JINKS, KONZELMAN, LOWERY, NEEL, NUNN, SHAULIS, WHITE, filed by PETER GATLYN. (No service copies.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (alb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less