This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2021 at 09:50:51 (UTC).

Gatewood v. Dillon Companies, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Gatewood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dillon Companies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02688

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dornee Gatewood

Denver, CO 80249

Dornee DeAnn Gatewood

Denver, CO 80249

Defendants

King Soopers

Kroger Companies

Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Larry S. McClung

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Saugat K. Thapa

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Katherine M.L. Pratt

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 November 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that a Settlement Conference is set on January 10, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. until 5:00 p.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S.Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#22

(#22) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 November 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to Correct Caption (Dkt. #18 ) isGRANTED; the case caption is amended to Dornee Gatewood v. Dillon Companies,LLC d/b/a King Soopers. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion to Set Settlement Conference. Magistrate Judge Neureiter is authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this case. The parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Neureiter's chambers at 303.335.2403 concerning scheduling. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/22/2021.(sdunb, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

19 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/17/2021. Counsel for Defendant shall prepare a proposed scheduling order. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for December 17, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#16

(#16) Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Complaint , Defenses, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by King Soopers, Kroger Companies.(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

1 #11

Exhibit I - Delay Reduction Order

1 #10

Exhibit H - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit F The Kroger Co. Cert of Good Standing

1 #7

Exhibit E - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #6

Exhibit D - Dillon Companies, LLC Cert of Good Standing

1 #5

Exhibit C - Voters Registration

1 #3

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 November 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that a Settlement Conference is set on January 10, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. until 5:00 p.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S.Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 November 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to Correct Caption (Dkt. #18 ) isGRANTED; the case caption is amended to Dornee Gatewood v. Dillon Companies,LLC d/b/a King Soopers. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion to Set Settlement Conference. Magistrate Judge Neureiter is authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this case. The parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Neureiter's chambers at 303.335.2403 concerning scheduling. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/22/2021.(sdunb, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM regarding #18 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Caption filed by King Soopers, Kroger Companies. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/22/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Hearing/Conference Settlement Conference by Defendants King Soopers, Kroger Companies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Caption by Defendants King Soopers, Kroger Companies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/17/2021. Counsel for Defendant shall prepare a proposed scheduling order. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for December 17, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Complaint , Defenses, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by King Soopers, Kroger Companies.(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #14 to Dornee Gatewood 5959 Dunkirk Street #8207 Denver, CO 80249. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5 October 2021. Status Conference set for 11/17/2021 11:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Status Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons upon Tim Davis, Manager. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT against King Soopers, Kroger Companies, filed by Dornee Gatewood.(jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saugat K. Thapa on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party King Soopers(pty:dft), Attorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party Kroger Companies(pty:dft) (Thapa, Saugat) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry S. McClung on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party King Soopers(pty:dft), Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party Kroger Companies(pty:dft) (McClung, Larry) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of All Defendants (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Companies, King Soopers from Denver District, Case Number 21CV422. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8106444), filed by Kroger Companies, King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Summons, #5 Exhibit C - Voters Registration, #6 Exhibit D - Dillon Companies, LLC Cert of Good Standing, #7 Exhibit E - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Exhibit F The Kroger Co. Cert of Good Standing, #9 Exhibit G - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit H - State Court Docket Sheet, #11 Exhibit I - Delay Reduction Order, #12 Exhibit J - Pre-Trial Order, #13 Exhibit K - Affidavit of Service)(Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dillon is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saugat K. Thapa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry S. McClung