This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 12:38:17 (UTC).

GATES et al v. HANJRA TRUCKING INC et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 GATES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HANJRA TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09314

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KENNETH GATES

CHERYL GATES

Defendants

EAST END TRUCKING CORPORATION

VIDAL A HERNANDEZ

HANJRA TRUCKING INC doing business as HTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAD S. TABAKIN

Attorney at TABAKIN WOLFE LLP

1000 Germantown Pike B-3

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

RICHARD ALEX WOLFE

Attorney at TABAKIN & WOLFE LLP

1000 Gernamtown Pike Unit B3

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER re #3 Letter; Plaintiffs' request for transfer is DENIED, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/26/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Letter from Plaintiffs. (TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 04/17/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to EAST END TRUCKING CORPORATION, HANJRA TRUCKING INC, VIDAL A HERNANDEZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EAST END TRUCKING CORPORATION, HANJRA TRUCKING INC, VIDAL A HERNANDEZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12373037) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KENNETH GATES, CHERYL GATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #3 Letter; Plaintiffs' request for transfer is DENIED, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/26/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Plaintiffs. (TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 04/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to EAST END TRUCKING CORPORATION, HANJRA TRUCKING INC, VIDAL A HERNANDEZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EAST END TRUCKING CORPORATION, HANJRA TRUCKING INC, VIDAL A HERNANDEZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12373037) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KENNETH GATES, CHERYL GATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD A. WOLFE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAD S. TABAKIN