This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 08:33:19 (UTC).

Gates et al v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Gates filed an Other lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly F. Pate and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00486

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly F. Pate

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Teresa Gates

Angela Irvin

Rhett King

Victoria Mann Bolling

Brianna Campbell

Raymond Hill

Evelyn Morris-Burrell

Nathan Flurry

Bianca Davidson

John Bruininks

Fannie Powell

Warrick Jackson

Laverne Robinson

Justin Grady Loveless

Kecia Nicole Johnson

Katrina Lashae Bass

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Katrina Lashae Bass

Apple, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

D. Frank Davis

Attorney at Davis & Norris, LLP

2154 Highland Avenue

Birmingham, AL 35205

John Edward Norris

Attorney at Davis & Norris LLP

2154 Highland Ave South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Kristan Bruce Rivers

Attorney at Davis & Norris LLP

2510 Lakeland Terace; Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39216

Wesley Warrington Barnett

Attorney at Davis & Norris, LLP

2154 Highland Ave South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Dargan M. Ware

Attorney at Davis & Norris LLP

2154 Highland Avenue

Birmingham, AL 35205

Dudley Frank Davis

Attorney at Davis & Norris, LLP

2154 Highland Avenue South; The Bradshaw House

Birmingham, AL 35205

Jeffrey P. Doss

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White LLC

The Clark Bldg - 400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Lana Alcorn Olson

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

M. Wesley Smithart

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Sara Anne Ford

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White

400 20Th Street North; The Clark Building

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Obligations Pending Ruling on Consolidation by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Change Venue (Unopposed Motion to Transfer) by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#12

(#12) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge; Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#11

(#11) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2021; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk Court by 9/8/2021; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 8/18/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Apple, Inc.. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/17/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 8/17/2021 (bes, ). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple, Inc..(Ford, Sara) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nathan Flurry re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Barnett, Wesley) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

6 #13

Exhibit M. Powell Disclosure

6 #9

Exhibit I. Johnson Disclosure

6 #2

Exhibit B. Bruininks Disclosure

#6

(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Katrina Lashae Bass, Victoria Mann Bolling, John Bruininks, Brianna Campbell, Bianca Davidson, Teresa Gates, Raymond Hill, Angela Irvin, Warrick Jackson, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Rhett King, Justin Grady Loveless, Evelyn Morris-Burrell, Fannie Powell, Laverne Robinson re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Bolling Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B. Bruininks Disclosure, #3 Exhibit C. Campbell Disclosure, #4 Exhibit D. Davidson Disclosure, #5 Exhibit E. Gates Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F. Hill Disclosure, #7 Exhibit G. Irvin Disclosure, #8 Exhibit H. Jackson Disclosure, #9 Exhibit I. Johnson Disclosure, #10 Exhibit J. King Disclosure, #11 Exhibit K. Loveless Disclosure, #12 Exhibit L. Morris-Burrell Disclosure, #13 Exhibit M. Powell Disclosure, #14 Exhibit N. Robinson Disclosure)(Barnett, Wesley) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

3 #1

Standing Order and Sample Format

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Teresa Gates, Angela Irvin, Rhett King, Victoria Mann Bolling, Brianna Campbell, Raymond Hill, Evelyn MorrisBurrell, Nathan Flurry, Bianca Davidson, John Bruininks, Fannie Powell, Warrick Jackson, Laverne Robinson, Justin Grady Loveless, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Katrina Lashae Bass; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

1 #3

Receipt

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

2018 Letter to Senate

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064035.), filed by Evelyn Morris-Burrell, Rhett King, Katrina Lashae Bass, Teresa Gates, Bianca Davidson, Warrick Jackson, Angela Irvin, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Brianna Campbell, Laverne Robinson, Nathan Flurry, John Bruininks, Fannie Powell, Victoria Mann Bolling, Raymond Hill, Justin Grady Loveless. (Attachments: #1 2018 Letter to Senate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Obligations Pending Ruling on Consolidation by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Change Venue (Unopposed Motion to Transfer) by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge; Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2021; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk Court by 9/8/2021; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 8/18/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Apple, Inc.. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #8 ANSWER - Attorney Lana Alcorn Olson, Jeffrey P. Doss, M. Wesley Smithart for Apple, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/17/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 8/17/2021 (bes, ). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple, Inc..(Ford, Sara) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nathan Flurry re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Barnett, Wesley) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Katrina Lashae Bass, Victoria Mann Bolling, John Bruininks, Brianna Campbell, Bianca Davidson, Teresa Gates, Raymond Hill, Angela Irvin, Warrick Jackson, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Rhett King, Justin Grady Loveless, Evelyn Morris-Burrell, Fannie Powell, Laverne Robinson re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Bolling Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B. Bruininks Disclosure, #3 Exhibit C. Campbell Disclosure, #4 Exhibit D. Davidson Disclosure, #5 Exhibit E. Gates Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F. Hill Disclosure, #7 Exhibit G. Irvin Disclosure, #8 Exhibit H. Jackson Disclosure, #9 Exhibit I. Johnson Disclosure, #10 Exhibit J. King Disclosure, #11 Exhibit K. Loveless Disclosure, #12 Exhibit L. Morris-Burrell Disclosure, #13 Exhibit M. Powell Disclosure, #14 Exhibit N. Robinson Disclosure)(Barnett, Wesley) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Apple, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Teresa Gates, Angela Irvin, Rhett King, Victoria Mann Bolling, Brianna Campbell, Raymond Hill, Evelyn MorrisBurrell, Nathan Flurry, Bianca Davidson, John Bruininks, Fannie Powell, Warrick Jackson, Laverne Robinson, Justin Grady Loveless, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Katrina Lashae Bass; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLFs) Katrina Lashae Bass, Victoria Mann Bolling, John Bruininks, Brianna Campbell, Bianca Davidson, Nathan Flurry, Teresa Gates, Raymond Hill, Angela Irvin, Warrick Jackson, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Rhett King, Justin Grady Loveless, Evelyn Morris-Burrell, Fannie Powell, Laverne Robinson. (bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Katrina Lashae Bass, Victoria Mann Bolling, John Bruininks, Brianna Campbell, Bianca Davidson, Nathan Flurry, Teresa Gates, Raymond Hill, Angela Irvin, Warrick Jackson, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Rhett King, Justin Grady Loveless, Evelyn Morris-Burrell, Fannie Powell, Laverne Robinson. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064035.), filed by Evelyn Morris-Burrell, Rhett King, Katrina Lashae Bass, Teresa Gates, Bianca Davidson, Warrick Jackson, Angela Irvin, Kecia Nicole Johnson, Brianna Campbell, Laverne Robinson, Nathan Flurry, John Bruininks, Fannie Powell, Victoria Mann Bolling, Raymond Hill, Justin Grady Loveless. (Attachments: #1 2018 Letter to Senate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(bes, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristan Bruce Rivers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley W Barnett