This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 08:14:55 (UTC).

Gastian v. Shell Exploration & Production Company

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Gastian filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Shell Exploration Production Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN GASTIAN

Defendant

Shell Exploration & Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregg M Rosenberg

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/24/2023 at 11:20 AM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

2 #1

Attachments

#3

(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred H Bennett for the following reason: agreement between the judges and related cases. Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified., filed. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Shell Exploration & Production Company served on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/17/2023, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Shell Exploration & Production Company served on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/17/2023, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred H Bennett for the following reason: agreement between the judges and related cases. Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified., filed. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/24/2023 at 11:20 AM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shell Exploration & Production Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29323259) filed by JOHN GASTIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less