This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2020 at 11:00:38 (UTC).

Gasser v. ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Gasser filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is R Bryan Harwell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02419

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R Bryan Harwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thuy N Gasser

Defendant

ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian A Taylor

Attorney at Hopkins Law Firm

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

Jeffrey D Morris

Attorney at Morris Law

811 6Th Avenue South

Surfside Beach, SC 29575

Joseph Clay Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins Law Firm

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

William E Hopkins, Jr

Attorney at Hopkins Law Firm

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

Defendant Attorneys

Victoria Therese Kepes

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Joshua Wallace Dixon

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: Certified copy of #11 Order on Motion to Remand emailed to Clerk of Court for Horry County. Certified copy also mailed to the same at P.O. Box 677 Conway, SC 29528. (hcic, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 8/13/2020. (hcic, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Beverly v. Grand Strand Regional Medical Center, LLC

9 #1

Exhibit BCBS of SC Preferred Provider Agreement

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/17/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BCBS of SC Preferred Provider Agreement)(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 7/28/2020 to remove proposed order (hcic, ). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit National Provider Identifiers Register for Defendant

6 #1

Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Thuy N Gasser. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit National Provider Identifiers Register for Defendant)No proposed order.(Hopkins, William) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 7/1/2020 to remove proposed order (hcic, ). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC.(hcic, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-26-03169 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9179401), filed by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (hcic, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: Certified copy of #11 Order on Motion to Remand emailed to Clerk of Court for Horry County. Certified copy also mailed to the same at P.O. Box 677 Conway, SC 29528. (hcic, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 8/13/2020. (hcic, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Thuy N Gasser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Beverly v. Grand Strand Regional Medical Center, LLC)(Hopkins, William) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/12/2020 with corrected document provided by filer) (hcic, ). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/17/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BCBS of SC Preferred Provider Agreement)(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer now due 15 days after the Court enters an Order ruling on Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 7/28/2020.(tmcb, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 7/28/2020 to remove proposed order (hcic, ). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Thuy N Gasser. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit National Provider Identifiers Register for Defendant)No proposed order.(Hopkins, William) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or file responsive pleading. Answer or responsive pleading now due August 3, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 7/1/2020.(tmcb, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 7/1/2020 to remove proposed order (hcic, ). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC.(hcic, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-26-03169 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9179401), filed by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast PC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (hcic, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACS Primary Care Physicians Southwest, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian A Taylor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey D. Morris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Clay Hopkins