This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2020 at 09:46:10 (UTC).

Gaspee Project et al v. Mederos et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Gaspee Project filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Mederos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Illinois Opportunity Project

The Gaspee Project

Defendants

Stephen P. Erickson

Diane C. Mederos

David H. Sholes

Richard H. Pierce

Jennifer L. Johnson

Dr. Isadore S. Ramos

William E. West

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert G. Flanders, Jr.

Attorney at Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Caroline R. Thibeault

Attorney at Whelan, Corrente, Flanders, Kinder & Siket LLP

100 Westminster Street

Providence, RI 02903

Daniel R. Suhr

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle St, #1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Brian Kelsey

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle Street, #1500

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

#2

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois Opportunity Project, The Gaspee Project. (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Illinois Opportunity Project, The Gaspee Project. All Defendants. (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Suhr ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian Kelsey. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/26/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Brian K. Kelsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1451371 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Flanders, Robert) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Daniel R. Suhr to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1451368 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Flanders, Robert) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline R. Thibeault on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Richard H. Pierce. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by Illinois Opportunity Project, The Gaspee Project. (Flanders, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Diane C. Mederos, Isadore S. Ramos, David H. Sholes, William E. West. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1449042 ), filed by Illinois Opportunity Project, Gaspee Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Flanders, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by Illinois Opportunity Project, The Gaspee Project. (Flanders, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Diane C. Mederos, Isadore S. Ramos, David H. Sholes, William E. West. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1449042 ), filed by Illinois Opportunity Project, Gaspee Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Flanders, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline R. Thibeault

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert G. Flanders, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Robert Suhr