Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2021 at 07:12:19 (UTC).

GARZA v. NOSCO, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 GARZA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NOSCO, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02083

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIVIAN GARZA

Defendants

RANDSTAD US, LLC

NOSCO, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT H. GRAFF

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE, P.C.

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by VIVIAN GARZA As To only Randstad US, LLC(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Executed by Joseph McCarty re: served Complaint and Summons upon Randstad US LLC by Personal on 06/09/2021, answer due 06/30/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) Modified on 6/10/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIVIAN GARZA. NOSCO, INC. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HON. TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/20/21. 5/21/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15102962.), filed by VIVIAN GARZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by VIVIAN GARZA As To only Randstad US, LLC(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Returned Executed by Joseph McCarty re: served Complaint and Summons upon Randstad US LLC by Personal on 06/09/2021, answer due 06/30/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) Modified on 6/10/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIVIAN GARZA. NOSCO, INC. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HON. TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/20/21. 5/21/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to NOSCO, INC., RANDSTAD US, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/6/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by VIVIAN GARZA. (tjd) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15102962.), filed by VIVIAN GARZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDSTAD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT H. GRAFF