This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:29:10 (UTC).

Garza v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Garza filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Elizabeth Cowan Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00060

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Garza

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Schmoll

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd.

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Zachary Scott Erickson

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd, Ste Apt 1

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Defendant Attorneys

Robert R Pohls

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel Keenan Ryan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Ste 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Margaret Ann Santos

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Margarita Gokhberg

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 S 7Th St, Ste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9259691) filed by Richard Garza. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erickson, Zachary) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MKB) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9285784 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert R. Pohls. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9285796 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert R Pohls for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/27/2022. (ABR) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert R. Pohls. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9285796 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9285784 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MKB) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-60 (PJS/ECW). (MKB) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9259691) filed by Richard Garza. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Erickson, Zachary) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Reins Pohls

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margarita Gokhberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Keenan Ryan