This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 08:02:57 (UTC).

Gary v. The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Gary filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01348

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kevin Wayne Gary

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Respondents

The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty

Jane Doe 1-10

David E. Ortiz

The Federal Bureau of Prisons

John Doe 1-10

The District Attorney for Baltimore City

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Andrew DiMiceli

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Maryland

200 St. Paul Place, 17Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Daniel John Jawor

Attorney at Office of the Maryland Attorney General

200 Saint Paul Pl

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Wayne Gary. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Jawor on behalf of The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty (Jawor, Daniel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER Directing respondents to file answer within 40 days. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/29/2019. (c/m 5/30/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew DiMiceli on behalf of The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty (DiMiceli, Andrew) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Cover Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew DiMiceli on behalf of The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty (DiMiceli, Andrew) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Jawor on behalf of The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty (Jawor, Daniel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Directing respondents to file answer within 40 days. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/29/2019. (c/m 5/30/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Wayne Gary. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.