This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:42:43 (UTC).

Garvin v. TransAm Trucking, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 Garvin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TransAm Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Garvin

Defendants

TransAm Trucking, Inc.

Marlon Kelley

Carolina Casualty Insurance Company

RLI Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W. Andrew Bowen

Attorney at William Andrew Bowen

7302 Abercorn St., Ste. 3, Po Box 15008

Savannah, GA 31416

Defendant Attorneys

Clay Seaton O'Daniel

Attorney at O'Daniel McDonald

9040 Roswell Road, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30350

William S. Weston

Attorney at O'Daniel McDonald

9040 Roswell Road, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30350

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3342481, Fee Amount $200, by Gregory Garvin. Responses due by 5/23/2022. (Bowen, W.) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

21 #2

Joint Status

21 #1

Civil Trial Info

21 #21

Main Document

20 #1

Corrected PDF

20 #20

*Restricted*

19 #1

Corrected PDF

19 #19

*Restricted*

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Flattened Document

#6

Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #6 due by 4/1/2022. (JH) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

5 #1

Notice

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Carolina Casualty Insurance Company, TransAm Trucking, Inc. (gmh) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gregory Garvin. (Bowen, W.) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#2

(#2) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Gregory Garvin. (Bowen, W.) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3342481, Fee Amount $200, by Gregory Garvin. Responses due by 5/23/2022. (Bowen, W.) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2022. Discovery due by 12/7/2022. Motions due by 1/9/2023. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/31/2022. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/30/2022. Status Report due by 12/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/6/22. (Attachments: #1 Civil Trial Info, #2 Joint Status) (loh) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (slt) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Daniel, Clay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2022: #1 Corrected PDF) (slt). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Marlon Kelley, TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2022: #1 Corrected PDF) (slt). (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting re #16 Motion to Dismiss RLI Insurance Company and Carolina Casualty Insurance Company without Prejudice. Accordingly, RLI Insurance Company and Carolina Casualty Insurance Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED amend the case caption to remove RLI Insurance Company and Carolina Casualty Insurance Company as defendants in this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/14/22. (loh) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting re #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William S. Weston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/12/22. (loh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION to Dismiss RLI Insurance Company and Carolina Casualty Insurance Company without Prejudice by Marlon Kelley, TransAm Trucking, Inc.. Responses due by 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Daniel, Clay) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, < Receipt Number AGASDC-3324124, Fee Amount $200. (thb) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3324124, Fee Amount $200, by Marlon Kelley, TransAm Trucking, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2022. (O'Daniel, Clay) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Garvin.(Bowen, W.) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing by Gregory Garvin re #1 Complaint Signed Civil Cover Sheet (Bowen, W.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2022: #1 Flattened Document) (JH). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #6 due by 4/1/2022. (JH) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet). (gmh) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (gmh) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFiling fee received: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3308958. (gmh) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Carolina Casualty Insurance Company, TransAm Trucking, Inc. (gmh) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gregory Garvin. (Bowen, W.) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Gregory Garvin. (Bowen, W.) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Garvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TransAm Trucking Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RLI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William S Weston