This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 08:40:30 (UTC).

Garrity Power Services LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Garrity Power Services LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00269

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garrity Power Services LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jaspal Singh Hare

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - Plano

5700 Granite Parkway, Suite 650

Plano, TX 75024

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Ryan Grant Cole

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - Plano

5700 Granite Parkway, Suite 650

Plano, TX 75024

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garrity Power Services LLC. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Grant Cole on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC (Cole, Ryan) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#10

(#10) CORRECTED SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#9

(#9) ***SEE CORRECTED SUMMONS # 10***SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ch, ). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jaspal Singh Hare on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7967469. (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jaspal Singh Hare on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Garrity Power Services LLC. (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Garrity Power Services LLC (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

2 #1

Summons(es)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - 067 patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Garrity Power Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7950831.), filed by Garrity Power Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 067 patent, #2 Exhibit B - claim chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garrity Power Services LLC. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 12/22/2020; Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd to 12/22/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Grant Cole on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC (Cole, Ryan) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORRECTED SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***SEE CORRECTED SUMMONS # 10***SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (ch, ) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ch, ). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jaspal Singh Hare on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7967469. (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jaspal Singh Hare on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Garrity Power Services LLC. (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Garrity Power Services LLC (Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Garrity Power Services LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Garrity Power Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7950831.), filed by Garrity Power Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 067 patent, #2 Exhibit B - claim chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hare, Jaspal) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaspal S Hare

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan G Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth L DeRieux