This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:04:01 (UTC).

Garpo Marine Services Inc. v. Island Romance et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Garpo Marine Services Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Island Romance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06875

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garpo Marine Services Inc.

Defendants

EL DORADO CRUISE LLC

ISLAND ROMANCE (Official No. 551624), her engines, boilers, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem

DHANESHWAR RAMLOCHAN

Island Romance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yaakov U. Adler

Attorney at Freehill Hogan & Mahar LLP

80 Pine Street, 25 Floor

New York, NY 10005

Peter J. Gutowski

Attorney at Freehill, Hogan & Mahar LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Summons

#18

(#18) Summons Issued as to El Dorado Cruise LLC, Island Romance, Dhaneshwar Ramlochan. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#16

(#16) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#15

(#15) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The proposed order directing the appointment of substitute custodian is So Ordered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/9/2020. (Guo, Alicia) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION in Further Support of Order Appointing Substitute Custodian by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#11

(#11) Proposed Pretrial Order Directing the Appointment of a Substitute Custodian by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST: the Clerk of this Court is authorized to issue the Process and the Warrant for Arrest in rem, pursuant to Rule C of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See attachment for details). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/17/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#9

(#9) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Yaakov U. Adler on behalf of Garpo Marine Services Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Adler, Yaakov) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Garpo Marine Services Inc.. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Garpo Marine Services Inc.. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EL DORADO CRUISE LLC, ISLAND ROMANCE (Official No. 551624), her engines, boilers, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem, DHANESHWAR RAMLOCHAN filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133393 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Garpo Marine Services Inc.. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Issued as to El Dorado Cruise LLC, Island Romance, Dhaneshwar Ramlochan. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The proposed order directing the appointment of substitute custodian is So Ordered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/9/2020. (Guo, Alicia) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION in Further Support of Order Appointing Substitute Custodian by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketORDER: Plaintiff seeks an order substituting itself as the custodian of the vessel Island Romance following execution of the arrest warrant previously issued by this Court. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the affirmation and proposed order for a substitute custodian upon the relevant office of the United States Marshal and to provide this Court with an attorney affirmation indicating whether the United States Marshal consents to Plaintiff's request to be appointed substitute custodian. Any submission shall be made by 1/08/2020. Plaintiff should also inform the Court about the position, if any, of the owner of Island Romance to the use of a substitute custodian. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/20/2019. (Guo, Alicia) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Pretrial Order Directing the Appointment of a Substitute Custodian by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST: the Clerk of this Court is authorized to issue the Process and the Warrant for Arrest in rem, pursuant to Rule C of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See attachment for details). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/17/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Yaakov U. Adler on behalf of Garpo Marine Services Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Adler, Yaakov) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garpo Marine Services Inc. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Garpo Marine Services Inc.. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Garpo Marine Services Inc.. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EL DORADO CRUISE LLC, ISLAND ROMANCE (Official No. 551624), her engines, boilers, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem, DHANESHWAR RAMLOCHAN filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133393 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Garpo Marine Services Inc.. (Gutowski, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less