This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 10:22:02 (UTC).

GAROUFALIS v. County of Wayne et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 GAROUFALIS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Wayne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth A. Stafford and Stephanie Dawkins Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-10170

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

Presiding Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLAS GAROUFALIS

Defendants

MARY HUMES

MICHELE INEZ DIGGS

Raphael Washington

JOHN DOEs 1-5

Stacey Coleman

DIONE WILSON

V. GRAHAM

Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC

Margaret Barden

LATAMYA MEADOWS

ANGELO N. PATSALIS

County of Wayne

OFFICER DRESHAJ

OFFICER PEREZ

ADRIENNE GARDNER

OFFICER MEINHEIT

OFFICER CARITHERS

OFFICER WALSH

OFFICER THOMAS

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul F. Doherty

Attorney at Johnson Law, PLC

Buhl Building, 535 Griswold Street, Suite 2632

Detroit, MI 48230

Madeline M. Sinkovich

Attorney at Johnson Law, PLC

535 Griswold St, Suite 2632

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan C. Lanesky

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 West Long Lake Rd., Suite 310

Troy, MI 48098

Ronald W. Chapman

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 West Long Lake Road, Suite 310

Troy, MI 48098

Paul T. O'Neill

Attorney at Wayne County Corporation Counsel

500 Griswold St, 30Th Fl

Detroit, MI 48226

Allegra Marie Lanni

Attorney at Wayne County Corporation Counsel

500 Griswold, 30Th Floor

Detroit, MI 48224

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #5

Document Continuation

12 #4

Document Continuation

12 #3

Document Continuation

12 #2

Document Continuation

12 #1

Document Continuation

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A- Obituary of Dr. Angelo Patsalis

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Allegra Marie Lanni on behalf of County of Wayne, Raphael Washington. (Lanni, Allegra) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Issued for *OFFICER CARITHERS, OFFICER DRESHAJ, ADRIENNE GARDNER, OFFICER HAMPTON, OFFICER MEINHEIT, OFFICER PEREZ, OFFICER STINSON, OFFICER THOMAS, OFFICER WALSH* (TTho) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketREQUEST for SUMMONS for OFFICER CARITHERS, OFFICER DRESHAJ, ADRIENNE GARDNER, OFFICER HAMPTON, OFFICER MEINHEIT, OFFICER PEREZ, OFFICER STINSON, OFFICER THOMAS, OFFICER WALSH. (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against OFFICER WALSH, OFFICER THOMAS, OFFICER HAMPTON, OFFICER STINSON, ADRIENNE GARDNER, OFFICER PEREZ, OFFICER DRESHAJ, OFFICER MEINHEIT, OFFICER CARITHERS. (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Margaret Barden waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; V. GRAHAM waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; MARY HUMES waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; LATAMYA MEADOWS waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; DIONE WILSON waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation) (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by County of Wayne, Raphael Washington. (O'Neill, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline M. Sinkovich on behalf of NICHOLAS GAROUFALIS. (Sinkovich, Madeline) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Angelo Patsalis, M.D. by Margaret Barden, V. GRAHAM, MARY HUMES, LATAMYA MEADOWS, DIONE WILSON, Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Obituary of Dr. Angelo Patsalis) (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan C. Lanesky appearing on behalf of Margaret Barden, V. GRAHAM, MARY HUMES, LATAMYA MEADOWS, DIONE WILSON, Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of Margaret Barden, V. GRAHAM, MARY HUMES, LATAMYA MEADOWS, DIONE WILSON, Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Chapman, Ronald) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Raphael Washington Wayne Count Sheriff (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs John Does 1-5 (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Wayne County (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Margaret Barden, Stacey Coleman, County of Wayne, MICHELE INEZ DIGGS, V. GRAHAM, MARY HUMES, JOHN DOEs 1-5, LATAMYA MEADOWS, ANGELO N. PATSALIS, DIONE WILSON, Raphael Washington, Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC* (TTho) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8298846 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: MACOMB - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: WAYNE. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Doherty, Paul) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madeline M. Sinkovich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul F. Doherty