This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2019 at 07:03:59 (UTC).

GARNETT et al v. INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 GARNETT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02866

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAREN GARNETT

KEITH GARNETT

Defendants

INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION

INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANK S. BLATCHER

Attorney at MALLON BLATCHER

12 S. Monroe Street

Media, PA 19063-2915

Defendant Attorneys

ERNEST FRANK KOSCHINEG

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

DAVID G. VOLK

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER PC

450 Sentry Pkwy Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BLATCHER, FRANK) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BLATCHER, FRANK) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ERNEST FRANK KOSCHINEG on behalf of INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and/or Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KOSCHINEG, ERNEST) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. VOLK on behalf of INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and/or Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199723.), filed by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ahf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BLATCHER, FRANK) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BLATCHER, FRANK) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ERNEST FRANK KOSCHINEG on behalf of INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and/or Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KOSCHINEG, ERNEST) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. VOLK on behalf of INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and/or Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. (ahf) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Summons Issued as to INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/1/2019 (ahf) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION, INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES HOLDINGS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199723.), filed by KAREN GARNETT, KEITH GARNETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ahf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION is a litigant