This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:51:52 (UTC).

Garnes v. Washington Manor et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Garnes filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Washington Manor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah M Fine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03199

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah M Fine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Garnes

Phoenix, AZ 85041

Defendants

Washington Manor

City of Phoenix Housing

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sharon Garnes. (BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sharon Garnes. (DXD) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Garnes.(BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03199-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 instructions)(BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

3 #1

instructions

#9

(#9) ORDER (Service Packet) - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall not file any further attachments to the Complaint. Service by waiver of the Summons and Complaint shall be at government expense on the Defendants by the United States Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Docs. #1 , #6 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Washington Manor and for Defendant City of Phoenix Housing. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packets to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 6/10/19. (DXD) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (Service Packet) - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall not file any further attachments to the Complaint. Service by waiver of the Summons and Complaint shall be at government expense on the Defendants by the United States Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Docs. #1 , #6 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Washington Manor and for Defendant City of Phoenix Housing. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packets to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 6/10/19. (DXD) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (#8) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sharon Garnes. (DXD) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03199-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 instructions)(BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sharon Garnes. (BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Garnes.(BAS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.