This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:27:39 (UTC).

Garlough v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Garlough filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison Claire and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01879

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Garlough

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Lithia DMID, Inc.

Lithia Motors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Connor Woolsey Olson

Attorney at Law Offices of Connor W. Olson

520 Capitol Mall, Suite 150

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Mary A. Stewart

Attorney at Donahue Davies LLC

P.O. Box 277010

Sacramento, CA 95827

Robert E. Davies

Attorney at Donahue Davies

P.O. Box 277010

Sacramento, CA 95827

Stephen A. D'Aunoy, PHV

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Thomas L. Azar, Jr., PHV

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Amanda J. Hettinger, PHV

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension re Rule 26(f) Deadline by Brian Garlough. (Olson, Connor) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lithia DMID, Inc., Lithia Motors, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Connor W. Olson* *Law Offices of Connor W. Olson* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 150* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#17

(#17) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Brian Garlough.(Olson, Connor) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#16

(#16) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/9/2020. Added attorney Amanda J. Hettinger, PHV for FCA US LLC. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#15

(#15) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by FCA US LLC for attorney Amanda J. Hettinger to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9231734) (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/4/2020 granting plaintiff 7 days to file his Second Amended Complaint for Damages with defendant's responsive pleading due 30 days thereafter. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages by Brian Garlough. (Olson, Connor) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION to DISMISS by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#10

(#18) MINUTE ORDER: On 10/23/2020, Defendant filed two Motions to Dismiss. ECF Nos. #10 and #11 . Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on 11/10/2020. ECF No. #17 . See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, Defendants pending Motions to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. The hearing on the motions, set for 12/8/2020, is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by FCA US LLC for attorney Stephen A. DAunoy to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stewart, Mary A. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9125756)(Stewart, Mary) Modified on 9/18/2020 (Donati, J). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

2 #3

VDRP

2 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UBC-2020-6595 by Brian Garlough. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-9124618) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension re Rule 26(f) Deadline by Brian Garlough. (Olson, Connor) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lithia DMID, Inc., Lithia Motors, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Connor W. Olson* *Law Offices of Connor W. Olson* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 150* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER: On 10/23/2020, Defendant filed two Motions to Dismiss. ECF Nos. #10 and #11 . Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on 11/10/2020. ECF No. #17 . See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, Defendants pending Motions to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. The hearing on the motions, set for 12/8/2020, is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Brian Garlough.(Olson, Connor) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/9/2020. Added attorney Amanda J. Hettinger, PHV for FCA US LLC. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by FCA US LLC for attorney Amanda J. Hettinger to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9231734) (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/4/2020 granting plaintiff 7 days to file his Second Amended Complaint for Damages with defendant's responsive pleading due 30 days thereafter. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages by Brian Garlough. (Olson, Connor) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by FCA US LLC in re #11 Motion to Dismiss. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to DISMISS by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to DISMISS by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STIPULATION to extend time to respond to first amended complaint by FCA US LLC. (Davies, Robert) Modified on 9/24/2020 (Reader, L). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/20. Added attorney Stephen A. D'Aunoy, PHV for Defendant FCA US LLC. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/20. Added attorney Thomas L. Azar, Jr., PHV for Defendant FCA US LLC. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by FCA US LLC for attorney Thomas L. Azar, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9125896) (Stewart, Mary) Modified on 9/18/2020 (Donati, J). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by FCA US LLC for attorney Stephen A. DAunoy to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stewart, Mary A. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9125756)(Stewart, Mary) Modified on 9/18/2020 (Donati, J). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UBC-2020-6595 by Brian Garlough. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-9124618) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davies, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less