This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 08:55:20 (UTC).

Garey v. Cardinal Health, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Garey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cardinal Health, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02732

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Garey

Defendants

Cardinal Health, Inc.

One Cloverleaf LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trisha M. Breedlove

Attorney at The Spitz Law Firm

307 Schrock Road, Ste 307

Columbus, OH 43229

Gregory T. Shumaker

Attorney at The Spitz Law Firm

1103 Schrock Road, Busch Corporate Center - Suite 307

Columbus, OH 43229

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Cardinal Health, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8946585), filed by Susan Garey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x3, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Form Summons x3

1 #3

Exhibit Right to Sue

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against One Cloverleaf LLC, filed by Susan Garey. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Summons x2) (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

3 #1

Summons Form Summons x2

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to One Cloverleaf LLC. (daf) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to One Cloverleaf LLC on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to One Cloverleaf LLC on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to One Cloverleaf LLC. (daf) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against One Cloverleaf LLC, filed by Susan Garey. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Summons x2) (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Cardinal Health, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8946585), filed by Susan Garey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x3, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Breedlove, Trisha) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cardinal Health Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory T. Shumaker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trisha M. Breedlove