This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2023 at 10:13:29 (UTC).

Garel et al v. Southern Fidelity Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Garel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Gerard Guidry and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05304

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carole Garel

Michael George Garel

Defendants

Southern Fidelity Insurance Company

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Azor Muckleroy

Attorney at Brasher Law Firm PLLC

1122 Orleans Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

Derek Clinton Brasher

Attorney at The Brasher Law Firm

1122 Orleans Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

Nishi Vimal Kothari

Attorney at Brasher Law Firm, PLLC

1122 Orleans Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Southern Fidelity Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9704788) filed by Carole Garel. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Joseph Azor Muckleroy added to party Carole Garel(pty:pla).(Muckleroy, Joseph) Modified on text/filers 12/20/2022 (cs). (Entered: 12/16/2022)

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cs) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cs) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

4 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Southern Fidelity Insurance Company filed by Carole Garel, Michael George Garel. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Muckleroy, Joseph) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

5 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. (mm) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Muckleroy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Muckleroy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. (mm) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Southern Fidelity Insurance Company filed by Carole Garel, Michael George Garel. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Muckleroy, Joseph) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cs) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cs) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Southern Fidelity Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9704788) filed by Carole Garel. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Joseph Azor Muckleroy added to party Carole Garel(pty:pla).(Muckleroy, Joseph) Modified on text/filers 12/20/2022 (cs). (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less