This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:20:56 (UTC).

Gardner v. Modern Metals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Gardner filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Modern Metals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Gardner

Defendant

Modern Metals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angie Marie Zinzilieta

Attorney at WENDLER LAW, P.C.

900 Hillsboro, Suite 10

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Brian M. Wendler

Attorney at WENDLER LAW, P.C.

900 Hillsboro, Suite 10

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorney

Susan Nell Rowe

Attorney at ROWE LAW OFFICE LLC

2117 Nebraska Ave.

St. Louis, MO 63104

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Case filing Form

1 #5

Defendant's Corporate Disclosure form

1 #1

Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff and Exhibits thereto

1 #2

Documents Filed in State Court

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri, case number 1922-CC00038, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff and Exhibits thereto, #2 Documents Filed in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case filing Form, #5 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure form)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ryan Gardner.(MFG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER OF REMAND IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this matter isREMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. cc: City(CLA) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III withoutPrejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) (ECF No. 16) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. 10) isGRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, Missouri. An appropriate Order of Remand will accompany this Order. #16 #10 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. (CLA) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and III Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and III Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Murray v. Marchbanks)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

17 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Murray v. Marchbanks

#8

(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Dungey Case)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER OF REMAND IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this matter isREMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. cc: City(CLA) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III withoutPrejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) (ECF No. 16) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. 10) isGRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City, Missouri. An appropriate Order of Remand will accompany this Order. #16 #10 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/3/19. (CLA) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and III Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Murray v. Marchbanks)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and III Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Dungey Case)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER - #10 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 10) is HELD IN ABEYANCE.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted until Monday, May 6, 2019, within which to conduct discovery and produce to the Court a copy of the individual employment contract between Plaintiff and Defendant. Response to Court due by 5/6/2019.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/20/19. (KKS) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Campbell v. Anytime Labor-Kansas LLC)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Ryan Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wendler, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Compel Use of Union Grievance Procedure by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exibit A Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff with Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Modern Metals, Inc..(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Certificate of Service Sent To: Plaintiff (Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal to State Court as Filed in the State Court, #2 State Court Docket Entries)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ryan Gardner.(MFG) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Modern Metals, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri, case number 1922-CC00038, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Modern Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Doerhoff and Exhibits thereto, #2 Documents Filed in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case filing Form, #5 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure form)(Rowe, Susan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less