This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 08:33:20 (UTC).

GARDNER et al v. ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 GARDNER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01977

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WENDELL GARDNER

DARLENE S. MATHIS

Defendant

ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Catherine A. Potthast

2324 West Joppa Road, Suite 425

Lutherville, MD 21093

Defendant Attorneys

George E. Reede, Jr.

Attorney at ZELLE LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 375

Washington, DC 20006

Jessica E. Pak

Attorney at ZELLE LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 375

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 Supplemental Memorandum Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

14 #6

Text of Proposed Order

14 #5

Exhibit M

14 #4

Exhibit L

14 #3

Exhibit K

14 #2

Exhibit J

14 #1

Exhibit I

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #11 Response to motion, AMENDED RESPONSE filed by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Potthast, Catherine) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#12

(#12) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Potthast, Catherine); Modified on 8/8/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Complaint

11 #1

Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Erie's

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

10 #10

Main Document

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 Supplemental Memorandum Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Memorandum in opposition to re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #11 Response to motion, AMENDED RESPONSE filed by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Potthast, Catherine) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR regarding #12 Supplemental Memorandum. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect format (Letter)- correspondence is not permitted (LCvR 5.1(a)). Please refile. (ztth) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Potthast, Catherine); Modified on 8/8/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Erie's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Potthast, Catherine) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Potthast, Catherine) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Receipt on 7/26/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 002715 B. (znmw) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Construing the parties' #8 Stipulation as a Joint Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties are notified that stipulated extensions are not permitted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss is due on or before August 5, 2022; and Defendant's Reply, if any, is due on or before August 26, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/21/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Extending Time by WENDELL GARDNER, DARLENE S. MATHIS. (Potthast, Catherine) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmh) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to jpak@zellelaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by George E. Reede, Jr on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY (Reede, George) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. Pak on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY (Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Pak, Jessica) Modified event on 7/18/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 002715 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9357406 filed by ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court of the District of Columbia Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Schenzel letter dated August 12, 2021, #4 Exhibit D - Gardner Personal Property Inventories, #5 Exhibit E - Schenzel letter dated July 16, 2020, #6 Exhibit F - Schenzel letter dated November 22, 2021, #7 Exhibit G - Nicholson letter dated September 18, 2019, #8 Exhibit H - Schenzel Affidavit, #9 Exhibit I - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Superior Court)(Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica E Pak

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George E Reede, Jr