This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 07:51:10 (UTC).

GARDELLA v. CINTAS et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 GARDELLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CINTAS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04793

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES T. GARDELLA

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

CINTAS

XYZ PARTNERSHIP

JOHN DOE OR JANE DOE

ABC CORPORATION

3Rd Party Defendant

ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACQUELINE M. ROSA

Attorney at BRADY BRADY & REILLY LLC

241 Kearny Avenue

Kearny, NJ 07601

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

JENNIFER MARIE BENNETT

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

MICHAEL B. DEVINS

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH, MULVANEY AND CARPENTER, LLP

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

11 #1

Joint Proposed Discovery Plan

#11

(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by CINTAS. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan)(DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#10

(#10) Letter from Michael B. Devins, Esq.. (DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#8

(#8) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP., filed by CINTAS.(DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CINTAS.(DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. DEVINS on behalf of CINTAS (DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE M. ROSA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROSA, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#4

(#4) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on April 14, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/15/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CINTAS from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-1066-21., filed by CINTAS.(BENNETT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CINTAS identifying Cintas Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BENNETT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE by CINTAS NOTICE OF REMOVAL (BENNETT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future filings similar to D.E. #10 , please select the event "Summons - Request for Issue" found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by CINTAS. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan)(DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Michael B. Devins, Esq.. (DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: The telephonic initial scheduling conference set for April 14, 2021 is rescheduled to May 27, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/31/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ABCO REFRIGERATION SUPPLY CORP., filed by CINTAS.(DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CINTAS.(DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. DEVINS on behalf of CINTAS (DEVINS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE M. ROSA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROSA, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on April 14, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/15/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $402.00, receipt number ANJDC-12253011. (ps) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CINTAS from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-1066-21., filed by CINTAS.(BENNETT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CINTAS identifying Cintas Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BENNETT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE by CINTAS NOTICE OF REMOVAL (BENNETT, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ PARTNERSHIPS is a litigant

Latest cases where CINTAS CORPORATION NO 2 DBA CINTAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant