This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 08:31:27 (UTC).

Gard v. Greyhound Lines Inc

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Gard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Greyhound Lines Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A Bastian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-05070

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A Bastian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Elaine Gard

Defendant

Greyhound Lines Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tamara Baldwin

Attorney at Parke Gordon LLC

7401 W Hood Place, Suite 208

Kennewick, WA 99336

Tamara R Baldwin

Attorney at Parke Gordan - KEN

7401 W Hood Place, Suite 208

Kennewick, WA 99336

Defendant Attorney

Robert Edward Barton

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

One Sw Columbia, Ste 800

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REMAND. Case remanded to Franklin County Superior Court. Case is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand filed by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Remand by Karen Elaine Gard. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Baldwin, Tamara) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Greyhound Lines Inc.(Barton, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Greyhound Lines Inc. to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REMAND. Case remanded to Franklin County Superior Court. Case is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand filed by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Remand by Karen Elaine Gard. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Baldwin, Tamara) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Greyhound Lines Inc.(Barton, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Greyhound Lines Inc. to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #BWAEDC-3777472 Filed by Greyhound Lines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit True and correct copies of all process, pleadings, and orders served., #3 Exhibit Copy state court docket., #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service.)(Barton, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greyhound Lines, Inc. is a litigant