This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2020 at 08:01:10 (UTC).

Garcoa, Inc. v. All Clean Natural Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Garcoa, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against All Clean Natural Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09827

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcoa, Inc.

Defendants

All Clean Natural Ltd.

Does I - X, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Painter

Attorney at Isaacman Kaufman Lowy and Zucker

1100 Glendon Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Jessica Bromall Sparkman

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation for Protective Order #10 , for the following reasons: Counsel shall consult Judge Kim's Procedures and Schedules Page; a redline in Microsoft Word format shall also be provided by email to Chambers at SK_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov that shows all differences between the submitted order and model order. (hr) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant All Clean Natural Ltd. identifying Balloon Guy Group of Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Clean Natural Ltd., identifying Balloon Guy Group of Companies, Inc., Garcoa, Inc.. (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant All Clean Natural Ltd..(Bromall Sparkman, Jessica) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOCKET NO. #14 ** Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Garcoa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Painter, Michael) Modified on 12/23/2020 (hr). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Clean Natural Ltd. answer now due 12/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant All Clean Natural Ltd..(Attorney Jessica Bromall Sparkman added to party All Clean Natural Ltd.(pty:dft))(Bromall Sparkman, Jessica) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant All Clean Natural Ltd. (esa) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Garcoa, Inc., identifying Garcoa, Inc.. (Painter, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Garcoa, Inc.. (Painter, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Garcoa, Inc.. (Painter, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-28723045 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Garcoa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Michael Allen Painter added to party Garcoa, Inc.(pty:pla))(Painter, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARCOA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Bromall Sparkman