This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:17:39 (UTC).

Garcia v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Garcia filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Molzen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen B. Molzen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Garcia

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Eilers Decker

Attorney at Decker Law Office, LLC

Po Box 92740

Albuquerque, NM 87199

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Holland

Attorney at Social Security Administration

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294

Manuel Lucero

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

Po Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Holland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Holland, Laura) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by David Garcia, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ln) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6935352 re 1 Complaint filed by David Garcia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Decker, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less