This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:05:51 (UTC).

Garcia v. Seven Seas Associates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Seven Seas Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis L. Sammartino and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janis L. Sammartino

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

Does 1-10

Seven Seas Associates, LLC

Best Western International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher A. Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Faythe Gutierrez

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Isabel Rose Masanque

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Jan Nicholas Marfori

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

400 South Hope Street, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert D. Infelise

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson LLP

50 California Street, Suite 3200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Best Western International, Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendant Best Western International, Inc. must file its response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before 3/25/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/25/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Best Western International, Inc. AMENDED (Marfori, Jan) (tcf). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Errata Regarding Certificate of Service [ECF No. 5] by Best Western International, Inc. re #5 Certificate of Service, (Marfori, Jan) QC mailer sent re: no provision for Notice of Errata (tcf). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Faythe Gutierrez on behalf of Orlando Garcia (Gutierrez, Faythe)Attorney Faythe Gutierrez added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla) (tcf). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Orlando Garcia (Masanque, Isabel Rose)Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla) (tcf). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Best Western International, Inc., Seven Seas Associates, LLC re #3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Marfori, Jan) (tcf). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orlando Garcia identifying Other Affiliate Center for Disability Access, counsel for plaintiff for Orlando Garcia. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Orlando Garcia. Identifying Other Affiliate Center for Disability Access, counsel for plaintiff for Orlando Garcia. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Seven Seas Associates, LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Handy, Russell) (tcf). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Best Western International, Inc., Seven Seas Associates, LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Marfori, Jan) (tcf). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) by Best Western International, Inc., Seven Seas Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Marfori, Jan)Attorney Jan Nicholas Marfori added to party Seven Seas Associates, LLC(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Best Western International, Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendant Best Western International, Inc. must file its response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before 3/25/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/25/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Extend Time for Best Western International, Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Best Western International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Marfori, Jan) QC mailer sent re: proposed order should not be attached (tcf). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Best Western International, Inc. AMENDED (Marfori, Jan) (tcf). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Errata Regarding Certificate of Service [ECF No. 5] by Best Western International, Inc. re #5 Certificate of Service, (Marfori, Jan) QC mailer sent re: no provision for Notice of Errata (tcf). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Faythe Gutierrez on behalf of Orlando Garcia (Gutierrez, Faythe)Attorney Faythe Gutierrez added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla) (tcf). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Orlando Garcia (Masanque, Isabel Rose)Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla) (tcf). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Best Western International, Inc., Seven Seas Associates, LLC re #3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Marfori, Jan) (tcf). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orlando Garcia identifying Other Affiliate Center for Disability Access, counsel for plaintiff for Orlando Garcia. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Orlando Garcia. Identifying Other Affiliate Center for Disability Access, counsel for plaintiff for Orlando Garcia. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Seven Seas Associates, LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15400436.), filed by Seven Seas Associates, LLC, Best Western International, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - All Docs Served on BW)The new case number is 3:21-cv-294-JLS-MDD. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seven Seas Associates, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faythe Gutierrez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isabel Rose Masanque