This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2019 at 07:45:11 (UTC).

Garcia v. Santander Consumer USA Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against Santander Consumer USA Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04817

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephane Garcia

Defendants

PAR Incorporated

Santander Consumer USA Incorporated

Knight Rider Towing & Recovery Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell Snow Thompson, IV

Attorney at Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

5235 E Southern Ave., Ste. D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorneys

Sydney Darci Goodhand

Attorney at Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA

2390 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 440

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Anthony Joseph Fernandez

Attorney at Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA

2390 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 440

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

#11

#6

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/20/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PAR Incorporated.(Goodhand, Sydney) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Knight Rider Towing & Recovery Incorporated.(Goodhand, Sydney) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER pursuant to #16 Stipulation to Set Aside Default: ORDERED setting aside default against Defendant PAR, Inc. PAR Incorporated answer due within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/19/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) *STIPULATION re: #11 Clerk's Entry of Default re: #15 Order (Stipulation to Set Aside) by PAR Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodhand, Sydney) *Modified to add document link on 9/20/2019 (REK). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER that PAR's answer (Doc. #13 ) is STRICKEN. PAR may move to set aside the Clerk's entry of default and, if such relief is granted, may refile its answer at that time. Alternatively, if the parties wish to avoid the expense of briefing a motion to set aside the Clerk's entry of default, they may file a stipulation to set aside the default and allow PAR to answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/18/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss Defendant Knight Rider Towing & Recovery Inc., only, without further order of the Court if Plaintiff does not file a status report within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/18/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) *STRICKEN by Doc. #15 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PAR Incorporated.(Goodhand, Sydney) Modified on 9/18/2019 (MMO). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephane Garcia: Return of Service re: Complaint upon Knight Rider Towing on August 23, 2019. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) *SET ASIDE per Doc. #17 * Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PAR Incorporated. (SLQ) Modified on 9/20/2019 (MMO). (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to PAR, Inc. by Stephane Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default)(Thompson, Russell) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 9/9/2019 (SLQ). (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by Stephane Garcia. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendant PAR, Inc. only, without further order of the Court, if Plaintiff fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/6/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephane Garcia: Return of Service re: Complaint upon PAR, Inc. on August 12, 2019. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/26/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Knight Rider Towing & Recovery Incorporated, PAR Incorporated, Santander Consumer USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17202906. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-4817-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Stephane Garcia. (Thompson, Russell) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAR) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17202906 filed by Stephane Garcia. (Thompson, Russell) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Snow Thompson, IV