This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2022 at 10:09:42 (UTC).

Garcia v. Nursing Corps., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 Garcia filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Nursing Corps , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia and Ruben B. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01572

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

Ruben B. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edith Garcia

Defendants

Nursing Corps., Inc.

Clayco,Inc.

Ethan Doe

Billy Doe

Mindy Vargo

Sahel Alizadeh

Jesse Cavazos

Does 1 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rodney Mesriani

Attorney at Mesriani Law Group

510 Arizona Avenue

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Zachary Michael Cantor

Attorney at Cantor Law

1112 Montana Avenue, Suite C

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Defendant Attorneys

Kirstin E. Muller

Attorney at Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP

233 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Laraya M. Parnell

Attorney at Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP

233 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Laraya Parnell

Attorney at Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP

233 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 600, 90401

Santa Monica, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration Kirstin E. Muller

1 #3

Declaration Steve Sieckhaus

1 #4

Declaration Tony Zimmerman

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. Identifying Other Affiliate Clayco Ventures, Inc., Other Affiliate Clayco Construction Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Clayco Design & Engineering, Inc. for Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (ggv) (anh). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (ggv) (anh). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/11/2023 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/25/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laraya Parnell on behalf of Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (Parnell, Laraya)Attorney Laraya Parnell added to party Clayco,Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laraya Parnell added to party Nursing Corps., Inc.(pty:dft)(jrm). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (Parnell, Laraya)(jrm). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#7) Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: On the Court's own motion, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2023 08:30 AM are vacated and rescheduled for 1/25/2023 08:30 AM. (no document attached) (cdc) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (Parnell, Laraya)(jrm). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laraya Parnell on behalf of Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (Parnell, Laraya)Attorney Laraya Parnell added to party Clayco,Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laraya Parnell added to party Nursing Corps., Inc.(pty:dft)(jrm). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/11/2023 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/25/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (ggv) (anh). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. Identifying Other Affiliate Clayco Ventures, Inc., Other Affiliate Clayco Construction Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Clayco Design & Engineering, Inc. for Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (ggv) (anh). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17247605.), filed by Clayco,Inc., Nursing Corps., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Kirstin E. Muller, #3 Declaration Steve Sieckhaus, #4 Declaration Tony Zimmerman)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1572-AJB-RBB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case.(ggv) (anh). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less