This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 14:09:01 (UTC).

Garcia v. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Garcia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00766

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Micheal Garcia

Diego Alejandro Diaz

Edwin Johnson

Sharnay Knight

Arnetta Nelson

Javier Cabrera

Hannah Dunn

Lindannette Curtis

Meghan Sallee

Heather Carter

Khiara Carter

Virginia Navarro

Antonio Monjarez

Joseph Melugin, Jr.

Natalie B. Aistrope-Golden

Anne Villarreal

Miguel De Alba

Alexis Carter

Petitioner

Kortni Hoover

Defendant

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

William Clifton Alexander

Attorney at Anderson Alexander, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Carter T. Hastings

Attorney at Anderson2X, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Lauren E. Braddy

Attorney at Anderson2X, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Alan Clifton Gordon

Attorney at Anderson2X, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Lincoln O. Bisbee

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Thomas Cullen Wallace

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Exhibit Consent of Anne Villarreal

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

3 #7

Exhibit Consent of Kayla Hightower

3 #6

Exhibit Consent of Denise Finck

3 #5

Exhibit Consent of Diego Alejandro Diaz

3 #4

Exhibit Consent of Lindannette Curtis

3 #3

Exhibit Consent of Heather Carter

3 #2

Exhibit Consent of Alexis Carter

3 #1

Exhibit Consent of Natalie B. Aistrope-Golden

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Micheal Garcia. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Lincoln O. Bisbee. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Anne Villarreal)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Cullen Wallace filed on behalf of Lincoln O. Bisbee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13824689) by on behalf of MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Ian A. Wright regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Thomas Cullen Wallace added to party MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:dft) by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kortni Hoover)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Javier Cabrera, #2 Exhibit Consent of Edricka Jimerson, #3 Exhibit Consent of Antonio Monjarez, #4 Exhibit Consent of Arnetta Nelson)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheal Garcia. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Khiara Carter)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Hannah Dunn)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Virginia Navarro)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (cd) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Natalie B. Aistrope-Golden, #2 Exhibit Consent of Alexis Carter, #3 Exhibit Consent of Heather Carter, #4 Exhibit Consent of Lindannette Curtis, #5 Exhibit Consent of Diego Alejandro Diaz, #6 Exhibit Consent of Denise Finck, #7 Exhibit Consent of Kayla Hightower, #8 Exhibit Consent of Edwin Johnson, #9 Exhibit Consent of Sharnay Knight, #10 Exhibit Consent of Shahraz Mahmoud, #11 Exhibit Consent of Elleri Martinez, #12 Exhibit Consent o Joseph Melugin, Jr, #13 Exhibit Consent of Jazmin Phelps, #14 Exhibit Consent of Meghan Sallee, #15 Exhibit Consent of Valerie Trinidad)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (cd) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Micheal Garcia. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13717486), filed by Micheal Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Micheal Garcia Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less