This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2022 at 07:12:13 (UTC).

Garcia v. Eastern Light Capital et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 Garcia filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Eastern Light Capital. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02284

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendants

Eastern Light Capital

Capital Alliance Income Trust, a Real Estate Investment Trust

Palou Market Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Centery for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Aaina Duggal

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street, Suite Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cara Patricia Townsend

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine St., Ste. 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Richard J. Morin

Attorney at Law Office of Rick Morin, PC

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 750

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Orlando Garcia re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Eastern Light Capital, Palou Market Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaina Duggal (Duggal, Aaina) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orlando Garcia.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2022) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPalou Market Inc. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2022) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Palou Market Inc (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2022) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Palou Market Inc served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2022) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Eastern Light Capital served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/23/2022) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Eastern Light Capital served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/23/2022) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Garcia. Palou Market Inc served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2022) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Palou Market Inc (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2022) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPalou Market Inc. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2022) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2022) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by Clerk on 04/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orlando Garcia.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Patricia Townsend (Townsend, Cara) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaina Duggal (Duggal, Aaina) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Eastern Light Capital, Palou Market Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Orlando Garcia re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17081132.). Filed byOrlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard John Morin